NY S04216 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.404
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.404
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the incorporation of the Fairview Firemen's Benevolent Association of the town of Greenburgh, county of Westchester, New York, and providing for the payment to such corporation of a portion of the taxes imposed by section five hundred fifty-three and five hundred fifty-four of the insurance law, in relation to the usage of moneys received from foreign fire insurance companies.
Title
Relates to the incorporation of the Fairview Firemen's Benevolent Association of the town of Greenburgh, county of Westchester, New York, and providing for the payment to such corporation of a portion of the taxes imposed by section five hundred fifty-three and five hundred fifty-four of the insurance law, in relation to the usage of moneys received from foreign fire insurance companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.404 |
2019-10-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.384 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7000b |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4216B |
2019-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1213 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4216A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07000 (Same As) 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.404