NY S04216 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the personal appearance requirement for voter registration or renewals.
Title
Removes the personal appearance requirement for voter registration or renewals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-12 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-03-10 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-02-16 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2017-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A04192 (Same As) 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken