NY S04203 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires putrescible and non-putrescible waste to be covered by a hard tarp when transported by rail.
Title
Requires putrescible and non-putrescible waste to be covered by a hard tarp when transported by rail.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2022-05-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1037 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2021-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |