NY S04182 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a servicer in a mortgage foreclosure action of residential real property to pay homeowners' association or cooperative fees as needed to maintain the property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires a servicer in a mortgage foreclosure action of residential real property to pay homeowners' association or cooperative fees as needed to maintain the property.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-13Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-12Senate1ST REPORT CAL.275
2019-03-04SenateREFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT

Same As/Similar To

A01800 (Same As) 2019-02-28 - advanced to third reading cal.69

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback