NY S04166 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.248
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the observance of September 11th Remembrance Day and provides for a brief period of silence on such day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the observance of September 11th Remembrance Day and provides for a brief period of silence on such day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-09AssemblySIGNED CHAP.248
2019-09-09SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-17Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-17Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.97
2019-06-17Assemblysubstituted for a1801b
2019-06-14Assemblyreferred to education
2019-06-14AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-14SenateREPASSED SENATE
2019-06-11SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4166A
2019-06-11SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-11Senatereturned to senate
2019-06-11AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-05-22Assemblyreferred to education
2019-05-22SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-20SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-15Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.708
2019-03-04SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A01801 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - substituted by s4166a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04166&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04166&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04166
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04166&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04166A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4166#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4166#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4166#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04166&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback