NY S04161 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.403
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the assessor of the town of Huntington, county of Suffolk, to accept from the South Huntington Union Free School District an application for exemption from real property taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the assessor of the town of Huntington, county of Suffolk, to accept from the South Huntington Union Free School District an application for exemption from real property taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-23AssemblySIGNED CHAP.403
2019-10-11SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.494
2019-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a6468
2019-04-29Assemblyreferred to real property taxation
2019-04-29SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-04-29SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-10SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-04-09Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-08Senate1ST REPORT CAL.386
2019-03-01SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A06468 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - substituted by s4161

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback