NY S04157 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the crime of falsely accusing someone of a crime.
Title
Creates the crime of falsely accusing someone of a crime.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1338 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-03-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A06584 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to codes