NY S04155 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4535A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4535A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the superintendent of financial services to conduct a review of the classification used by authorized insurers in this state issuing auto insurance coverage for commuter vans, ambulette or paratransit vehicles, including coverage in the assigned risk plan; makes related provisions.
Title
Requires the superintendent of financial services to conduct a review of the classification used by authorized insurers in this state issuing auto insurance coverage for commuter vans, ambulette or paratransit vehicles, including coverage in the assigned risk plan; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. James Sanders [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4535A |
2022-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1926 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4155A |
2022-05-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1160 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A04535 (Same As) 2022-11-23 - tabled