NY S04135 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the New York emergency responder act limiting the liability of certain emergency responders.
Title
Enacts the New York emergency responder act limiting the liability of certain emergency responders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1232 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1548 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4135A |
2017-06-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-03-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A04241 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes