NY S04128 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a plea of guilty and the payment of fines or penalties electronically via the internet.
Title
Authorizes a plea of guilty and the payment of fines or penalties electronically via the internet.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2023-03-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.440 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05655 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to transportation