NY S04098 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.402
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the purpose and use of the foreign fire insurance premium taxes by the Snyder Volunteer Firemen's Benevolent Association; changes name to "Firefighter's".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the purpose and use of the foreign fire insurance premium taxes by the Snyder Volunteer Firemen's Benevolent Association; changes name to "Firefighter's".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-23AssemblySIGNED CHAP.402
2019-10-11SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-17Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-17Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.166
2019-06-17Assemblysubstituted for a7432b
2019-06-13Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-13SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1340
2019-06-13SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-06SenatePRINT NUMBER 4098B
2019-06-06SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-05-08SenatePRINT NUMBER 4098A
2019-05-08SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-02-28SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A07432 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - substituted by s4098b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04098&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04098&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04098
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04098&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04098A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04098&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04098B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4098#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4098#SC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04098&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback