NY S04095 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.596
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.596
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale and use of pavement products containing coal tar.
Title
Prohibits the sale and use of pavement products containing coal tar.
Sponsors
Sen. James Sanders [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. John Mannion [D] | Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.596 |
2021-10-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.157 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a518a |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-04-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-30 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4095B |
2021-03-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.585 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4095A |
2021-02-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2021-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00518 (Same As) 2021-06-02 - substituted by s4095b