NY S04089 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes political subdivisions and certain public authorities to establish demonstration programs implementing railroad grade crossing monitoring systems by means of photo devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes political subdivisions and certain public authorities to establish demonstration programs implementing railroad grade crossing monitoring systems by means of photo devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblyreferred to transportation
2019-06-17AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-17SenateREPASSED SENATE
2019-06-14SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4089A
2019-06-14SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-14Senatereturned to senate
2019-06-14AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-03-12Assemblyreferred to transportation
2019-03-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.254
2019-03-11SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-02-27SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A06012 (Same As) 2019-06-15 - print number 6012a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback