NY S04086 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the elimination of fees and renewal fees associated with the issuance of distinctive license plates for purple heart recipients.
Title
Relates to the elimination of fees and renewal fees associated with the issuance of distinctive license plates for purple heart recipients.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. John Bonacic [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] |
Sen. Christopher Jacobs [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Elaine Phillips [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2018-02-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.210 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4086A |
2017-06-14 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2017-06-14 | Senate | returned to senate |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-04-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-04-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.471 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00154 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation