NY S04085 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6195A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6195A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the manufacture, distribution, and sale of child care products containing TRIS.
Title
Prohibits the manufacture, distribution, and sale of child care products containing TRIS.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6195A |
2011-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1465 |
2011-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4085A |
2011-06-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2011-03-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06195 (Same As) 2011-08-01 - signed chap.259