NY S04083 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.696
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.696
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the employer's ability to suspend a police officer without pay pending disciplinary charges.
Title
Relates to the employer's ability to suspend a police officer without pay pending disciplinary charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.696 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1767 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4083A |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-14 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-14 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.139 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | rules report cal.139 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-05 | Senate | amend and recommit to rules 5821a |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-19 | Senate | referred to governmental employees |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5821A |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1767 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4083A |
2019-06-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05821 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.696