NY S04082 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires single-purpose day camps to ascertain whether an employee or volunteer is listed on the state sex offender registry pursuant to article six-C of the correction law; defines "single-purpose day camp".
Title
Requires single-purpose day camps to ascertain whether an employee or volunteer is listed on the state sex offender registry pursuant to article six-C of the correction law; defines "single-purpose day camp".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Assembly | referred to health |
2018-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1490 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1142 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00618 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to health