NY S04080 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-8)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the licensing of persons engaged in the design, construction, operation, inspection, maintenance, alteration and repair of elevators and other automated people moving devices and creates the New York state elevator safety and standards board and the elevator and related conveyances safety program account, in cities with a population of less than one million (Part A); relates to the licensing of approved elevator agency directors, inspectors, and technicians performing elevator work in the city of New York (Part B).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the licensing of persons engaged in the design, construction, operation, inspection, maintenance, alteration and repair of elevators and other automated people moving devices and creates the New York state elevator safety and standards board and the elevator and related conveyances safety program account, in cities with a population of less than one million (Part A); relates to the licensing of approved elevator agency directors, inspectors, and technicians performing elevator work in the city of New York (Part B).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.545
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a4509a
2019-06-18Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-18AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenateREPASSED SENATE
2019-06-14SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 4080C
2019-06-14SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-14Senatereturned to senate
2019-06-14AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-05-29Assemblyreferred to labor
2019-05-29SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-29SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-21SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 4080B
2019-05-20SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-15Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.728
2019-05-09SenatePRINT NUMBER 4080A
2019-05-09SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2019-04-09SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-02-27SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A04509 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s4080c

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04080&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04080&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04080
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04080&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04080A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04080&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04080B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04080&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04080C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4080#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4080#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4080#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4080#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04080&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback