NY S04072 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - SIGNED CHAP.38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - SIGNED CHAP.38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the building inspector of the town of Wallkill, in the county of Orange, need not be a resident of such town, so long as he or she resides in such county.
Title
Provides that the building inspector of the town of Wallkill, in the county of Orange, need not be a resident of such town, so long as he or she resides in such county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.38 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.224 |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | substituted for a5671a |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-04-04 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2017-03-27 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4072A |
2017-03-27 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-27 | Senate | returned to senate |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2017-03-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.236 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05671 (Same As) 2017-05-03 - substituted by s4072a