NY S04069 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A260
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A260
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the exemption from taxation for micro-hydroelectric energy systems, fuel cell electric generating systems, or micro-combined heat and power generating equipment systems.
Title
Relates to the exemption from taxation for micro-hydroelectric energy systems, fuel cell electric generating systems, or micro-combined heat and power generating equipment systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A260 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.459 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A00260 (Same As) 2017-10-23 - signed chap.336