NY S04068 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.233
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.233
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the expiration of the authorization to the county of Wyoming to impose an additional one percent sales and compensating use tax from November 30, 2023 to November 30, 2025.
Title
Extends the expiration of the authorization to the county of Wyoming to impose an additional one percent sales and compensating use tax from November 30, 2023 to November 30, 2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.233 |
2023-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | home rule request |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.518 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | substituted for a6054 |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-23 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2023-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.897 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | REFERENCE CHANGED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2023-03-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4068A |
2023-03-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2023-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A06054 (Same As) 2023-06-05 - substituted by s4068a