NY S04049 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the performance of a study regarding homeless persons who are veterans in the state of New York.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the performance of a study regarding homeless persons who are veterans in the state of New York.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-05-01Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-01Assemblyordered to third reading cal.199
2019-05-01Assemblysubstituted for a5660
2019-03-25Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-03-25SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-25SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-19SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4049A
2019-03-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-13Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-12Senate1ST REPORT CAL.274
2019-02-26SenateREFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT

Same As/Similar To

A05660 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - substituted by s4049a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback