NY S04046 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - APPROVAL MEMO.56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - APPROVAL MEMO.56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to jewelry containing lead.
Title
Relates to jewelry containing lead.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.56 |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.671 |
2019-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.421 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | substituted for a6041 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-04-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.445 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06041 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - APPROVAL MEMO.56