NY S04040 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes towns in the Peconic Bay region to establish community housing funds to be funded by a supplemental real estate transfer tax; defines terms; outlines eligible expenses; establishes an advisory board in any town which has established a community housing fund to review and make recommendations regarding the town's community housing plan; makes related provisions.
Title
Authorizes towns in the Peconic Bay region to establish community housing funds to be funded by a supplemental real estate transfer tax; defines terms; outlines eligible expenses; establishes an advisory board in any town which has established a community housing fund to review and make recommendations regarding the town's community housing plan; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.247 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1766 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4040A |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.348 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | rules report cal.348 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-13 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-12 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-04 | Senate | print number 4941b |
2019-06-04 | Senate | amend and recommit to local governments |
2019-02-26 | Senate | print number 4941a |
2019-02-26 | Senate | amend and recommit to local governments |
2019-02-05 | Senate | referred to local governments |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4941B |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1766 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4040A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A04941 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - tabled