NY S04036 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the board of elections in cities with a population of one million or more to provide at least one interpreter for all languages that are designated city-wide languages at poll sites that contain an election district with at least fifty voting age residents whose limited English proficiency language is a designated city-wide language.
Title
Requires the board of elections in cities with a population of one million or more to provide at least one interpreter for all languages that are designated city-wide languages at poll sites that contain an election district with at least fifty voting age residents whose limited English proficiency language is a designated city-wide language.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-06-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4036C |
2019-06-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4036B |
2019-05-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4036A |
2019-04-17 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2019-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06075 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to election law