NY S04026 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants uniformed court officers in the village of Sag Harbor in Suffolk county peace officer status.
Title
Grants uniformed court officers in the village of Sag Harbor in Suffolk county peace officer status.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-03-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.719 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.968 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A04218 (Same As) 2022-02-01 - REFERRED TO CODES