NY S04024 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4216
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4216
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the enforcement by the village of Sagaponack of interests in real property acquired for the purposes of open space or open areas.
Title
Relates to the enforcement by the village of Sagaponack of interests in real property acquired for the purposes of open space or open areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4216 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1328 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A04216 (Same As) 2021-07-16 - signed chap.247