NY S04023 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - PRINT NUMBER 4023A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - PRINT NUMBER 4023A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a tax deduction for the adoption of a child with special needs.
Title
Provides for a tax deduction for the adoption of a child with special needs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4023A |
2018-02-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1065 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07145 (Same As) 2018-02-23 - print number 7145a