NY S04020 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-18 - signed chap.680
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-18 - signed chap.680
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits telemarketers from knowingly placing unsolicited telemarketing sales calls during a state of emergency or disaster emergency.
Title
Prohibits telemarketers from knowingly placing unsolicited telemarketing sales calls during a state of emergency or disaster emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Senate | signed chap.680 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.549 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4020A |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.438 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | rules report cal.438 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-14 | Senate | print number 117a |
2019-06-14 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2019-06-03 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A117A |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4020A |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.549 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00117 (Same As) 2019-12-18 - signed chap.680