NY S04004 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3004D
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3004D
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Capital Projects Budget.
Title
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Capital Projects Budget.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3004D |
2023-05-01 | Senate | MESSAGE OF NECESSITY - 3 DAY MESSAGE |
2023-05-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.715 |
2023-04-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4004D |
2023-04-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2023-04-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4004C |
2023-04-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2023-03-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4004B |
2023-03-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2023-03-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4004A |
2023-03-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2023-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03004 (Same As) 2023-05-12 - thru line veto memo.36