NY S04000 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-12-06 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to maternal depression treatment; requires the commissioner of health, in collaboration with the commissioner of mental health, to compile a list of providers who treat or provide support for maternal depression.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to maternal depression treatment; requires the commissioner of health, in collaboration with the commissioner of mental health, to compile a list of providers who treat or provide support for maternal depression.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.518
2017-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a8308
2017-06-07Assemblyreferred to health
2017-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-05SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1460
2017-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-02-01SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A08308 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s4000

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback