NY S03984 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "New York state procurement integrity act".
Title
Enacts the "New York state procurement integrity act".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2018-05-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1125 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-22 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3984A |
2017-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.623 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06355 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to governmental operations