NY S03960 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - PRINT NUMBER 3960B
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - PRINT NUMBER 3960B
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "monk parakeet protection act".
Title
Enacts the "monk parakeet protection act".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3960B |
2016-02-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2016-01-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3960A |
2016-01-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2015-02-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00540 (Same As) 2016-02-25 - print number 540a