NY S03960 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - PRINT NUMBER 3960B
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - PRINT NUMBER 3960B
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for distribution to the public, over the internet, of information regarding credit card rates, charges, terms and other conditions; further provides for dissemination of information over the internet regarding types of bank accounts available, requirements for opening an account, and all fees charged the customer, including monthly fees and transaction fees.
Title
Provides for distribution to the public, over the internet, of information regarding credit card rates, charges, terms and other conditions; further provides for dissemination of information over the internet regarding types of bank accounts available, requirements for opening an account, and all fees charged the customer, including monthly fees and transaction fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3960B |
2012-06-18 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2012-04-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3960A |
2012-04-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2012-01-18 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2011-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A04829 (Same As) 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken