NY S03959 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - SIGNED CHAP.431
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - SIGNED CHAP.431
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits activities of alien insurance brokers with respect to property/casualty insurance.
Title
Permits activities of alien insurance brokers with respect to property/casualty insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.431 |
2017-11-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.584 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a97a |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3959A |
2017-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.675 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A00097 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s3959a