NY S03958 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - PRINT NUMBER 3958A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - PRINT NUMBER 3958A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to firearms; authorizes the transfer of certain weapons from an estate to an immediate member of the decedent's family; relates to reports of substantial risk or threat of harm by mental health professionals; and repeals certain provisions of law relating thereto.
Title
Relates to firearms; authorizes the transfer of certain weapons from an estate to an immediate member of the decedent's family; relates to reports of substantial risk or threat of harm by mental health professionals; and repeals certain provisions of law relating thereto.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3958A |
2018-01-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A03421 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - print number 3421a