NY S03954 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - PRINT NUMBER 3954A
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - PRINT NUMBER 3954A
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the confinement of companion animals in unattended motor vehicles under conditions that endanger the health or well-being of an animal and what can be done in the event an animal is seen suffering; adds paid or volunteer firefighters as persons authorized to remove such companion animals from unattended vehicles because of extreme temperatures; and provides penalties.
Title
Relates to the confinement of companion animals in unattended motor vehicles under conditions that endanger the health or well-being of an animal and what can be done in the event an animal is seen suffering; adds paid or volunteer firefighters as persons authorized to remove such companion animals from unattended vehicles because of extreme temperatures; and provides penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3954A |
2018-05-29 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2017-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A04029 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES