NY S03940 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a New York Main Street development center in the division of housing and community renewal.
Title
Establishes a New York Main Street development center in the division of housing and community renewal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2018-03-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.521 |
2018-01-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3940A |
2018-01-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2017-03-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.209 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |