NY S03936 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A282A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A282A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the issuance of distinctive plates for AMVETS.
Title
Relates to the issuance of distinctive plates for AMVETS.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A282A |
2017-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2025 |
2017-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3936A |
2017-05-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00282 (Same As) 2017-07-25 - signed chap.105