NY S03931 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - PRINT NUMBER 3931A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - PRINT NUMBER 3931A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the interagency coordinating committee on rural public transportation.
Title
Relates to the interagency coordinating committee on rural public transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3931A |
2018-01-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1545 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04733 (Same As) 2018-01-22 - print number 4733a