NY S03927 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 3927A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 3927A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the sale, availability and distribution of healthy foods and beverages on school property and at school sponsored functions; sets forth portion size and food requirements; sets forth requirements and provides for the sale of such foods in school stores, vending machines, school cafeterias; requires nutritional information on all food items and beverages which are not prepackaged with such; and requires the commissioner of education, in consultation with the commissioner of health, to establish a procedure for engaging school wellness committees.
Title
Provides for the sale, availability and distribution of healthy foods and beverages on school property and at school sponsored functions; sets forth portion size and food requirements; sets forth requirements and provides for the sale of such foods in school stores, vending machines, school cafeterias; requires nutritional information on all food items and beverages which are not prepackaged with such; and requires the commissioner of education, in consultation with the commissioner of health, to establish a procedure for engaging school wellness committees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3927A |
2012-01-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2011-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06229 (Same As) 2012-04-26 - held for consideration in education