NY S03923 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - approval memo.32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - approval memo.32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reforms the statutory short form and other powers of attorney for purposes of financial and estate planning.
Title
Reforms the statutory short form and other powers of attorney for purposes of financial and estate planning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Senate | approval memo.32 |
2020-12-15 | Senate | signed chap.323 |
2020-12-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.589 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3923A |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5630a |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.216 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.269 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | rules report cal.269 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-14 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2020-07-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5630A |
2020-06-10 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3923A |
2020-03-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.589 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1061 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A05630 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - approval memo.32