NY S03918 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "buy from the backyard act"; requires the office of general services and other state agencies to buy 20% of all their food products from producers and/or processors in New York state; provides that the commissioner of agriculture and markets shall determine the New York food products that are available during the various times during the year; directs such commissioner to report to the governor and the legislature on the implementation of such provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "buy from the backyard act"; requires the office of general services and other state agencies to buy 20% of all their food products from producers and/or processors in New York state; provides that the commissioner of agriculture and markets shall determine the New York food products that are available during the various times during the year; directs such commissioner to report to the governor and the legislature on the implementation of such provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2018-04-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-04-18Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-04-17Senate1ST REPORT CAL.788
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-08Assemblyreferred to agriculture
2017-06-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-05-24Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-05-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1266
2017-01-30SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A02185 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to agriculture

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback