NY S03915 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enlarges the definition of the term "election" for certain purposes.
Title
Enlarges the definition of the term "election" for certain purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.681 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03723 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to education