NY S03905 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of health, in consultation with the commissioner of the office of general services, to conduct a study on the use of solid antimicrobial materials for touch surfaces in the construction of public buildings.
Title
Directs the commissioner of health, in consultation with the commissioner of the office of general services, to conduct a study on the use of solid antimicrobial materials for touch surfaces in the construction of public buildings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2021-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3905A |
2021-05-21 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2021-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A00998 (Same As) 2022-01-12 - REFERRED TO LABOR