NY S03905 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the provision of law that volunteer firefighters and ambulance workers who receive a real property tax exemption for service may not receive the income tax credit for such service; makes technical corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals the provision of law that volunteer firefighters and ambulance workers who receive a real property tax exemption for service may not receive the income tax credit for such service; makes technical corrections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2105
2018-06-20SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-01-26SenatePRINT NUMBER 3905A
2018-01-26SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-15Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-06-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1716
2017-06-14SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-01-30SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A05045 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - print number 5045a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback