NY S03900 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 3900A
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 3900A
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for free hunting, fishing and trapping licenses to residents of the state who are active duty members of the U.S. armed forces regardless of where such person is stationed.
Title
Provides for free hunting, fishing and trapping licenses to residents of the state who are active duty members of the U.S. armed forces regardless of where such person is stationed.
Sponsors
Sen. Catharine Young [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. John Bonacic [R] | Sen. George Latimer [D] |
Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. George Maziarz [R] | Sen. Ted O'Brien [D] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3900A |
2014-01-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2013-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06011 (Same As) 2014-02-04 - print number 6011a