NY S03899 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the liability of the state to any person who suffers damage as a result of a defect in a state highway.
Title
Relates to the liability of the state to any person who suffers damage as a result of a defect in a state highway.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] |
Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1004 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-03-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.633 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04139 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - ordered to third reading rules cal.678