NY S03898 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows certain interactive poker games be considered games of skill rather than games of luck; includes definitions, authorization, required safeguards and minimum standards, the scope of licensing review and state tax implications; makes corresponding penal law amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows certain interactive poker games be considered games of skill rather than games of luck; includes definitions, authorization, required safeguards and minimum standards, the scope of licensing review and state tax implications; makes corresponding penal law amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13Assemblyreferred to racing and wagering
2017-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-05SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 3898A
2017-05-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-05-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-05-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.895
2017-02-14SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2017-01-27SenateREFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING

Same As/Similar To

A05250 (Same As) 2017-06-15 - reported referred to codes

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback