NY S03897 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8936A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8936A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases state funding for construction and improvements by the department of transportation where the municipality agrees to fund a complete street design feature as a component of the project.
Title
Increases state funding for construction and improvements by the department of transportation where the municipality agrees to fund a complete street design feature as a component of the project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8936A |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1527 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-03-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08936 (Same As) 2022-12-28 - approval memo.79